Saturday, March 5, 2011

Fun with Multiplying a number by 11.

Multiplying a number by 11

The simplest mutiplication is the multiplication by number 11

Take,
Example 1: 12345 x 11


We have to just add the consequent numbers given on the left side to get
the answers and so


12345 x 11 = 1 / 1+2 /2+3 /3+4 /4+5 / 5
= 1 /3/5/7/9/5


Therefore 12345 x 11 = 135795


Example 2 : 3628418 x 11


= 3 / 3+6 / 6+2 / 2+8 / 8+4 /4+1 /1+8 /8
= 3/9/8/12/5/9/8
= 3/9/9/12/5/9/8

Therefore 3628418 x 11 = 39912598

Febriana Febriana

About Febriana Febriana

Author Description here.. Nulla sagittis convallis. Curabitur consequat. Quisque metus enim, venenatis fermentum, mollis in, porta et, nibh. Duis vulputate elit in elit. Mauris dictum libero id justo.